People's representatives who have ruled since 1987
Serial No | Period | Name of Representative |
---|---|---|
1 | 1991.07.16 - 1994.01.27 | Mr. K.D.W.P. Mr.Kumarasinghe |
2 | 1994.01.28 - 1997.01.27 | Mr. KA Roshan Dhammika Kulatunga |
3 | 1997.04.15 - 2002.04.09 | Mr. R.P Dilip Kumara Rajapaksa |
4 | 2002.05.07 - 2006.04.04 | Mr. D. Charles Weerasekera |
6 | 2006.04.17 - 2014.01.30 | Mr. Sahan Pradeep Withana |
7 | 2014.02.01 - 2015.05.15 | Mr. Susanthasiri Vanniarachchi |
8 | 2018.05 - 2023.03.19 | Mrs. Sudeema Chandani |